Global Patent Index - EP 1048988 A2

EP 1048988 A2 2000-11-02 - Locking device for a watch winding button

Title (en)

Locking device for a watch winding button

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für eine Uhrenaufzugskrone

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage de la couronne de remontoir d'une montre

Publication

EP 1048988 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00108228 A

Priority

CH 77499 A

Abstract (en)

A lever (2) is fitted to the side of a watchcase (1) and may be rotated about an axis (4). The lever has a curved central portion (7) which engages with a throat in the winding crown (3) such thatthe latter may not inadvertently slide longitudinally. In the locked position the lever (2) is secured by an elongated semicircular section (6) which fits over a locking stop (5).

Abstract (fr)

Lors d'utilisations de montres bracelet pour la plongée ou les sports d'action, on souhaite pouvoir éviter que la couronne de remontoir soit par inadvertance tirée et l'heure involontairement déréglée. Pour éviter cela, la couronne (3) présente une forme générale de H et un levier (2) vient s'engager dans la gorge (10) de ladite couronne (3) pour empêcher celle-ci d'être tirée par erreur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/041 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048988 A2 20001102; EP 1048988 A3 20010516; US 6679624 B1 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-04-10 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2009-04-15 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18RA

- Effective date: 20090309

2008-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071109

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMOMARK SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MOUAWAD, ALAIN

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI