Global Patent Index - EP 1048988 A3

EP 1048988 A3 2001-05-16 - Locking device for a watch winding button

Title (en)

Locking device for a watch winding button

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für eine Uhrenaufzugskrone

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage de la couronne de remontoir d'une montre

Publication

EP 1048988 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 00108228 A

Priority

CH 77499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1048988A2] A lever (2) is fitted to the side of a watchcase (1) and may be rotated about an axis (4). The lever has a curved central portion (7) which engages with a throat in the winding crown (3) such thatthe latter may not inadvertently slide longitudinally. In the locked position the lever (2) is secured by an elongated semicircular section (6) which fits over a locking stop (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 3/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1048988 A2 20001102; EP 1048988 A3 20010516; US 6679624 B1 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-04-10 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2009-04-15 [18RA] RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20090309

2008-09-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080320

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071109

2003-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMOMARK SA

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOUAWAD, ALAIN

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI