Global Patent Index - EP 1049067 A2

EP 1049067 A2 2000-11-02 - A hinged advertising panel

Title (en)

A hinged advertising panel

Title (de)

Klappbare Werbewand

Title (fr)

Panneau de publicité à charnière

Publication

EP 1049067 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109374 A

Priority

DE 19919930 A

Abstract (en)

The folding display wall (1) has hinged wall parts (2-4), which are formed of a base body (6) of filling material covered by cover material (7), and which have an uncovered holder for a connector (5) to connect the wall parts together. The holder is for as a recess in the edge part of the wall part, with an opening in the end face of the wall part to hold the connector. Independent claims are included for a connector to connect individual wall parts and a method to connect individual wall pa

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein klappbare Werbewand (1), bestehend aus miteinander schwenkbar verbundenen Wandteilen (2, 3, 4), wobei das einzelne Wandteil (2, 3, 4) aus einem Füllmaterial (6), einem das Füllmaterial (6) wenigstens teilweise umschließenden Abdeckmaterial (7) und wenigstens einer vom Abdeckmaterial (7) abgedeckten Aufnahme für ein Verbindungselement (5) zur Verbindung einzelner Wandteile (2, 3, 4) miteinander besteht, wobei die Aufnahme wenigstens eine im zusammengebauten Zustand des Wandteils aus Füllmaterial (6) und Abdeckmaterial (7) im Randbereich des Wandteils ausgebildete Ausnehmung (16) ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0068 (2013.01); A47B 2220/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049067 A2 20001102; EP 1049067 A3 20010207; DE 19919930 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI