Global Patent Index - EP 1049113 A3

EP 1049113 A3 2001-01-17 - Improvements in and relating to magnetic devices

Title (en)

Improvements in and relating to magnetic devices

Title (de)

Verbesserungen an und in Bezug auf magnetische Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Améliorations relatives à des dispositifs magnétiques

Publication

EP 1049113 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00650039 A

Priority

IE 990349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1049113A2] A magnetic device of separate non-interacting magnetic components housed in a housing 4. Each component has a central core 5 and a winding 2 and 3. Each core 5 has an air gap 6. The windings 2 and 3 extend beyond the air gap 6. This gives increase reluctance confining the magnetic field in the core 5. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 3/14; H01F 27/36; H01F 30/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 3/14 (2006.01); H01F 27/02 (2006.01); H01F 27/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/292 (2013.01); H01F 3/14 (2013.01); H01F 27/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049113 A2 20001102; EP 1049113 A3 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071127

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070514

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01F 3/14 A, 7H 01F 30/10 B, 7H 01F 27/36 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI