Global patent index - EP 1049120 A2

EP 1049120 A2 2000-11-02 - Luminous push button key

Title (en)

Luminous push button key

Title (de)

Leuchtdrucktaster

Title (fr)

Bouton poussoir lumineux

Publication

EP 1049120 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105869 A

Priority

DE 19914758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19914758C1] The device has a hollow cylindrical housing (2) containing a movable hollow cylindrical piston (3). It also contains a return spring (4) supported at one end against the housing and at the other end against the spring. A light element, particularly a bulb is arranged inside the piston. A switch element (13) is fastened to the bulb end of the housing. A plastic part (14) is integrated into the end of the housing. The rest of the housing is made of metal.

Abstract (de)

Es soll ein Leuchtdrucktaster (1) mit einer möglichst optimalen Wärmetoleranz bezüglich der im Innenraum des Stößels (3) liegenden Glühlampe (8) geschaffen werden. Hierzu ist im Innenraum des Stößels (3) eine Rückstellfeder (4) vorgesehen, die sich einerseits an Auflageflächen (10,11) des Stößels (3) und des Gehäuses (2) abstützt, was eine Vergrößerung des Innendurchmessers des Stößels (3) als Lösung des Problems ermöglicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/18; H01H 13/02; H01H 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/02 (2006.01); H01H 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/023 (2013.01); H01H 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906908 U1 19990812; DE 19914758 C1 20000817; EP 1049120 A2 20001102; EP 1049120 A3 20020320

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020401

2003-01-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI