Global Patent Index - EP 1049123 A1

EP 1049123 A1 2000-11-02 - Control device with three positions for electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Control device with three positions for electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung mit drei Positionen für Elektrogerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande à trois positions pour appareillage électrique

Publication

EP 1049123 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400954 A

Priority

FR 9905232 A

Abstract (en)

The three position command mechanism has a shaft driving a Maltese cross shape section (11) with slots. The Maltese cross section rotates in one of two directions using spigot sections (12). A rotation position is set by an end stop (16). A complementary sto shaft is formed in each direction using the interplay of stop elements (17) preventing engagement of intermediate positions.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de commande à trois positions est commandé par un arbre de commande (2) solidaire d'une croix de Malte (11) comportant deux fentes d'entraînement et entraînée en rotation d'une position angulaire déterminée à une parmi deux autres positions angulaires déterminées, par l'un ou l'autre de deux ergots (12, 12') fixés sur un arbre d'entraînement (7) et associés à une came (13) complémentaire ladite croix de Malte. Il est caractérisé en ce que ledit arbre d'entraînement est limité en rotation par l'action d'une butée d'arrêt fixe (16) qui assure un arrêt dans chacun des deux sens de rotation aux deux positions extrêmes de début et de fin de rotation choisies, et en ce qu'un mécanisme complémentaire d'arrêt des arbres permet d'empêcher la rotation des arbres dans chacun des deux sens de rotation pour la position intermédiaire déterminée, par interposition d'un élément d'arrêt (17 ou 17') sur le trajet suivi par un élément complémentaire saillant que porte un des arbres. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/52; H01H 3/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/44 (2006.01); H01H 33/52 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/44 (2013.01); H01H 33/52 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049123 A1 20001102; CA 2306675 A1 20001026; FR 2792767 A1 20001027; FR 2792767 B1 20010525; US 6400244 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI