Global Patent Index - EP 1049125 A2

EP 1049125 A2 2000-11-02 - Thermal switching device

Title (en)

Thermal switching device

Title (de)

Thermische Schalteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation thermique

Publication

EP 1049125 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102668 A

Priority

DE 19918708 A

Abstract (en)

A fixed and moving pair of contacts on a support element (2) form a switch contact section. Fastened on the support element, thermally sensitive element (12) has thermally caused movement that can transfer to this pair of contacts. The thermally sensiti element is formed by a sensor unit (13) resetting the support element or mounted on it on both sides or on opposite areas. The sensor element's coefficient of expansion differs from that of the support element.

Abstract (de)

Thermische Schaltvorrichtung, insbesondere für Haushaltsgeräte, Lüftungs- und Klimatechnik, Heizgeräte und dgl. mit einem Trägerelement, in/an welchem mindestens ein Fest- und Bewegungskontaktpaar zur Bildung mindestens einer Schaltkontaktstrecke vorgesehen sind und in/an dem ein thermisch-sensitives Element befestigt ist, dessen thermisch verursachte Bewegung auf das Fest- und Bewegungskontaktpaar übertragbar ist, wobei das thermisch-sensitive Element 12 durch einen entweder beidendseitig oder an sich gegenüberliegenden Bereichen am Trägerelement 2, 32 eingespannten oder einen dieses umspannenden Sensorkörper 13, 43 gebildet wird, dessen Ausdehnungskoeffizient sich von dem des Trägerelementes 2, 32 unterscheidet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/46; H01H 37/48; H01H 37/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/48 (2006.01); H01H 37/50 (2006.01); H01H 37/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/50 (2013.01); H01H 37/48 (2013.01); H01H 37/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049125 A2 20001102; EP 1049125 A3 20011212; DE 19918708 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021019

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI