Global Patent Index - EP 1049125 A3

EP 1049125 A3 2001-12-12 - Thermal switching device

Title (en)

Thermal switching device

Title (de)

Thermische Schalteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation thermique

Publication

EP 1049125 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00102668 A

Priority

DE 19918708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1049125A2] A fixed and moving pair of contacts on a support element (2) form a switch contact section. Fastened on the support element, thermally sensitive element (12) has thermally caused movement that can transfer to this pair of contacts. The thermally sensiti element is formed by a sensor unit (13) resetting the support element or mounted on it on both sides or on opposite areas. The sensor element's coefficient of expansion differs from that of the support element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/46; H01H 37/48; H01H 37/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/48 (2006.01); H01H 37/50 (2006.01); H01H 37/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/50 (2013.01); H01H 37/48 (2013.01); H01H 37/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049125 A2 20001102; EP 1049125 A3 20011212; DE 19918708 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021019

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI