Global patent index - EP 1049167 A2

EP 1049167 A2 2000-11-02 - Semiconductor device and manufacturing method thereof

Title (en)

Semiconductor device and manufacturing method thereof

Title (de)

Halbleiterbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif à semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1049167 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00108989 A

Priority

  • JP 12492499 A
  • JP 20696199 A

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor device having high operating performance and reliability, and a manufacturing method thereof are provided. An LDD region 207 provided in an n-channel TFT 302 forming a driving circuit enhances the tolerance for hot carrier injection. LDD regions 217 - 220 provided in an n-channel TFT (pixel TFT) 304 forming a pixel portion greatly contribute to the decrease in the OFF current value. Here, the LDD region of the n-channel TFT of the driving circuit is formed such that the concentration of the n-type impurity element becomes higher as the distance from an adjoining drain region decreases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 27/12; H01L 21/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/336 (2006.01); H01L 21/77 (2006.01); H01L 21/84 (2006.01); H01L 27/12 (2006.01); H01L 29/423 (2006.01); H01L 29/49 (2006.01); H01L 29/786 (2006.01); G02F 1/1362 (2006.01); H01L 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/2026 (2013.01); H01L 21/3003 (2013.01); H01L 27/1255 (2013.01); H01L 29/42384 (2013.01); H01L 29/4908 (2013.01); H01L 29/66757 (2013.01); H01L 29/78621 (2013.01); G02F 1/13454 (2013.01); H01L 27/3244 (2013.01); H01L 29/78645 (2013.01); H01L 2029/7863 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049167 A2 20001102; EP 1049167 A3 20071024; EP 2256808 A2 20101201; JP 2009105410 A 20090514; JP 2009152615 A 20090709; JP 4387443 B2 20091216; JP 4637948 B2 20110223; US 2002163035 A1 20021107; US 2003129791 A1 20030710; US 2004214439 A1 20041028; US 2006121736 A1 20060608; US 2009212294 A1 20090827; US 2011089428 A1 20110421; US 2012097960 A1 20120426; US 6534826 B2 20030318; US 6753257 B2 20040622; US 7015141 B2 20060321; US 7573069 B2 20090811; US 7858987 B2 20101228; US 8097884 B2 20120117; US 8748898 B2 20140610

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20080215

2007-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI