Global Patent Index - EP 1049194 A2

EP 1049194 A2 2000-11-02 - Rotor device for a satellite reception assembly

Title (en)

Rotor device for a satellite reception assembly

Title (de)

Antennenrotor für eine Satellitenempfangsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif rotative pour antenne de réception par satellite

Publication

EP 1049194 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201516 A

Priority

MT 134499 A

Abstract (en)

A polar rotor device (1) for a satellite reception assembly (100), apt to drive eastward and westward rotations of a dish antenna (300) of such assembly, comprising: a motor (2); a transmission system (3), interposed between the motor and the dish antenna to transform the output motion of the motor into the eastward and westward rotations of the dish antenna, wherein the rotations comprise descending rotations, during which the dish antenna is rotated downward, and ascending rotations, during which the dish antenna is rotated upward; and elastic means (4), arranged at the transmission system, apt to store elastic energy during the descending rotations, and to return elastic energy during the ascending rotations, so that the rotor device can be fed by a receiver of the satellite reception assembly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/005 (2013.01); H01Q 1/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049194 A2 20001102; EP 1049194 A3 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI