Global patent index - EP 1049210 A1

EP 1049210 A1 2000-11-02 - Connector cover

Title (en)

Connector cover

Title (de)

Verschlusskappe für Verbinder

Title (fr)

Couvercle de fermeture pour connecteur

Publication

EP 1049210 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00303337 A

Priority

SG 1999001818 A

Abstract (en)

A cover (10) for covering an opening (101) of a connector (100) containing an electrical mating structure (170). The cover (10) overlaps the opening (101) when installed and has a flat plate portion (20) from a rear surface of which lateral movement restraining parallel first walls (70) project adjacent its sides which have bottom surfaces (71) which ride over a bottom edge (108) of the opening (101) as the cover is rotated or slid into engagement with the connector (100). A U-shaped locking arm (50) extends rearwardly adjacent an upper cover edge, has a free end which does not project forwardly of the cover plate portion (20) and an upwardly directed locking projection (53) which engages a locking shoulder (130) on an upper surface of the opening (101). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/447 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049210 A1 20001102; EP 1049210 B1 20071128; DE 60037217 D1 20080110; DE 60037217 T2 20081009; JP 2000323234 A 20001124; JP 3463802 B2 20031105; SG 90047 A1 20020723

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090419

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090419

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080417

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60037217

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-01-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-11-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061027

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI