Global Patent Index - EP 1049215 A2

EP 1049215 A2 2000-11-02 - Electrical multi-angle plug connector

Title (en)

Electrical multi-angle plug connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Mehrwinkel-Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique à fiche à angles multiples

Publication

EP 1049215 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107440 A

Priority

US 30318599 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical pin-and-socket connector (10) has a casing (12), several conductive connectors (14) fitted in the casing and a flange stretching outwards from the casing. The flange has multiple removable parts (22).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektrischen Steckverbinder (10) mit einem Gehäuse (12), mehreren in dem Gehäuse (12) gestützten leitenden Anschlüssen (14) und einem sich von dem Gehäuse (12) nach außen erstreckenden Flansch (20). Der Flansch (20) weist mehrere gezielt entfernbare Teile (22) auf, damit der Steckverbinder (10) bei Entfernen eines der Teile (22) zur Verwendung in einer bestimmten abgewinkelten Montageposition angepaßt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/18 (2013.01); Y10S 439/954 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049215 A2 20001102; EP 1049215 A3 20040225; US 6155875 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/642 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/74 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/64 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI