Global patent index - EP 1049276 A1

EP 1049276 A1 2000-11-02 - Digital broadcast system

Title (en)

Digital broadcast system

Title (de)

Digitales Rundfunksystem

Title (fr)

Système de diffusion numérique

Publication

EP 1049276 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00108813 A

Priority

GB 9909838 A

Abstract (en)

The invention which is the subject of this application relates to use of a data transmission system of the sort which is currently used to allow digital data relating to television programmes to be transmitted from a broadcast location, via satellite (6), cable or terrestrial transmission systems to be received by at least one receiver in a premises. The receiver (10) is typically connected to a display screen (14) to allow the display of television programmes generated from the transmitted data. In this invention, the receiver (10) is connected to a further item of apparatus at or in the vicinity of the premises and the control of said further apparatus is achieved via the receiver (10). Operating commands are issued by the receiver (10) and are generated in response to flag data which is transmitted along with the other data and the receiver (10) is capable of reacting to the said flag data and sending a control command to the further apparatus. The flag data can also be used to indicate information data which can be further processed by the further apparatus as controlled by the receiver (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2008.01); H04H 60/27 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/13 (2013.01); H04H 60/27 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049276 A1 20001102; GB 9909838 D0 19990623

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PACE PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080508

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001202

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI