Global Patent Index - EP 1049332 A2

EP 1049332 A2 2000-11-02 - Method, apparatus and medium for recording digital information signal

Title (en)

Method, apparatus and medium for recording digital information signal

Title (de)

Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Medium zur Aufzeichnung eines digitalen Informationssignals

Title (fr)

Procédé, appareil et medium pour l'enregistrement d'un signal d'information numèrique

Publication

EP 1049332 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301954 A

Priority

JP 12138099 A

Abstract (en)

A first stream of data for normal playback is recorded. The first data stream includes packets which are loaded with portions of the normal-playback data respectively. The packets in the first data stream contain information pieces representing a first packet ID. A second stream of data for special playback is recorded. The second data stream includes packets which are loaded with portions of the special-playback data respectively. The packets in the second data stream contain information pieces representing a second packet ID. The first packet ID and the second packet ID are equal to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/926; H04N 5/783; H04N 9/804

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/765 (2006.01); G11B 20/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/781 (2006.01); H04N 5/783 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 9/804 (2006.01); H04N 9/82 (2006.01); H04N 9/85 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 9/8042 (2013.01); H04N 5/783 (2013.01); H04N 9/8227 (2013.01); H04N 9/85 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049332 A2 20001102; EP 1049332 A3 20031119; EP 1049332 B1 20090429; EP 1049332 B9 20091028; CN 1271939 A 20001101; DE 60042095 D1 20090610; JP 2000312340 A 20001107; JP 3436505 B2 20030811

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD., YOKOHAMA, JP

- Document: DE 60042095

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD., YOKOHAMA, KANAGAWA, JP

- Document: DE 60042095

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60042095

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60042095

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

2010-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100201

2009-06-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60042095 P 20090610

2009-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-04-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040615

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 5/926 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 9/804 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 5/783 B

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI