Global patent index - EP 1049344 A1

EP 1049344 A1 2000-11-02 - Base station equipment for a mobile telecommunications network

Title (en)

Base station equipment for a mobile telecommunications network

Title (de)

Basisstationsanlage für ein mobiles Vermittlzngsnetz

Title (fr)

Equipement pour station de base d'un réseau de télécommunications mobile

Publication

EP 1049344 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99303280 A

Priority

EP 99303280 A

Abstract (en)

Radio units are proposed having an enclosure containing a radio transmitter, a radio receiver and a processor for communicating with mobile terminals via the transmitter and the receiver and with a switching centre via an uplink data port and a transmission line having a nominal impedance. It is further proposed to provide a downlink data port connected directly by at least one pair of conductors to the uplink data port so that two or more radio units can be daisy chained together. A downlink port of a first radio unit would be connected to an uplink port of a second radio unit, so that the second can communicate with the switching centre via the first The invention is based on the recognition that at the end of the daisy chain, the at least one pair of conductors needs to be terminated in the nominal impedance of the transmission line or reflections will occur. It is desired that all radio units should be identical, in the sense that there is no desire to have a special radio unit to terminate a transmission line. The last radio unit in the chain, being most remote in the chain from the switching centre, is disclosed having connected to its downlink port an adapter connecting the conductors in the or each pair with an impedance having the nominal impedance of the transmission line. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0830041 A2 19980318 - LUCENT TECH NETWORK SYS GMBH [DE]
  • [A] US 4686671 A 19870811 - BURIAN THEODOR [DE], et al
  • [A] BURIAN T: "SWTICHING PHILOSOPHY OF THE DIGITAL CELLULAR RADIO TELEPHONE SYSTEMCD900", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NORDIC SEMINAR ON DIGITAL LAND MOBILE RADIOCOMMUNICATION (DMR), ESPOO, FINLAND, FEB. 5 - 7, 1985, 5 February 1985 (1985-02-05), GENERAL DIRECTORATE OF POSTS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS;FINLAND, pages 271 - 278, XP000405980

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1049344 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041228

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010420

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI