Global Patent Index - EP 1049391 A1

EP 1049391 A1 2000-11-08 - TOOTHBRUSH COMPRISING IMPROVED MEANS FOR FIXING FRICTION ELEMENTS

Title (en)

TOOTHBRUSH COMPRISING IMPROVED MEANS FOR FIXING FRICTION ELEMENTS

Title (de)

ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT VERBESSERTEN BEFESTIGUNGSMITTEL DER REIBUNGSELEMENTEN

Title (fr)

BROSSE A DENTS COMPORTANT DES MOYENS PERFECTIONNES DE FIXATION DES ELEMENTS DE FRICTION

Publication

EP 1049391 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900979 A

Priority

  • FR 9900122 W
  • FR 9800798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773961A1] The foot of each rod (20) is anchored to the main body (16) of the head in a hole (24) passing through the head. A bridge (28) of material located outside the hole connects the upper and lower ends of the rod foot, and is in contact with the corresponding surfaces of the main body (16) of the head. The bridges on a number of rods can be molded in one piece from an elastomer material, forming a rim round the brush head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/22 (2006.01); A46B 9/06 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A46B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937182A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773961 A1 19990730; FR 2773961 B1 20000310; AT 223667 T 20020915; AU 2061599 A 19990809; BR 9907250 A 20030218; CZ 20002597 A3 20010314; CZ 296914 B6 20060712; DE 69902878 D1 20021017; DE 69902878 T2 20030410; DK 1049391 T3 20030113; EP 1049391 A1 20001108; EP 1049391 B1 20020911; ES 2183503 T3 20030316; HU 0100363 A2 20010528; HU 0100363 A3 20010928; HU 224360 B1 20050829; JP 2002500904 A 20020115; JP 4259757 B2 20090430; MY 118893 A 20050228; NO 20003097 A 20000920; NO 20003097 D0 20000615; NO 325210 B1 20080225; PL 190130 B1 20051130; PL 341935 A1 20010507; PT 1049391 E 20021231; RU 2197162 C2 20030127; SA 1412 B1 20061011; SI 1049391 T1 20021231; SK 10742000 A3 20010212; SK 285805 B6 20070802; TW 464485 B 20011121; US 6463618 B1 20021015; WO 9937182 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170117

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160122

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170109

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160121

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-11-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223667 T

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160131

2016-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160131

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150107

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120121

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANOFI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69902878

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANOFI-AVENTIS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69902878

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902878

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902878

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902878

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-09-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020404127

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-07-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20101220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070121

2005-12-21 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-04-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS; FR

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SANOFI -AVENTIS

2005-03-31 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Free text: SANOFI-AVENTIS FR

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SANOFI-AVENTIS

- Free text: SANOFI-SYNTHELABO#174, AVENUE DE FRANCE#75013 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- SANOFI-AVENTIS#174, AVENUE DE FRANCE#75013 PARIS (FR)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183503 T3

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404127

2003-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902878 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000726;SI PAYMENT 20000726

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223667 T 20020915

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000726;SI PAYMENT 20000726