Global Patent Index - EP 1049524 A1

EP 1049524 A1 2000-11-08 - CAPTIVE KITE

Title (en)

CAPTIVE KITE

Title (de)

FESSELDRACHEN

Title (fr)

CERF-VOLANT CAPTIF

Publication

EP 1049524 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98955577 A

Priority

  • DE 29801046 U
  • EP 9807242 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937373A1] Disclosed is a new technical component for a kite in the form of a check loop (4) serving to variably fix the straight and/or curved kite rods (3) regardless of the diameter of the rod thereby influencing the tension of the sail. Said check loops (4) provide two special advantages in relation to ordinary plastic rod connectors or tunnel-like batten pockets placed on the surface of the sail (1) with the purpose of rigidly fixing the rods. On the one hand, less time is needed for sewing and assembly during production while on the other hand the central sail area (1) can be optionally be decorated with a valuable design due to the fact that it remains fully untouched or intact since no fixing seams or reinforcing materials are required inside border or edge surrounding the sail (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937373A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801046 U1 19980312; EP 1049524 A1 20001108; EP 1049524 B1 20040804; WO 9937373 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040804

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-11-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041115

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811773 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL