Global Patent Index - EP 1049569 A1

EP 1049569 A1 2000-11-08 - DRILL BITS AND HOLDERS THEREFOR

Title (en)

DRILL BITS AND HOLDERS THEREFOR

Title (de)

BOHRMEISSEL UND DESSEN WERKZEUGHALTER

Title (fr)

TREPAN ET PORTE-OUTIL CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1049569 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958729 A

Priority

  • AU 9800977 W
  • AU PP053097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928093A1] A drill bit comprising a shank (2) of nominal 10mm diameter for engagement within a tool holder (20), said shank comprising diametrically-opposed driving keyways (4, 6) opening onto an end face of the shank and at least one locking groove (12) spaced from the end of the shank, the two driving keyways being of different cross section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/02; B23B 45/14; B23B 51/00; B23Q 3/00; B25D 17/08; E21B 10/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/02 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 17/02 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0034 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928093 A1 19990610; AU PP053097 D0 19971218; EP 1049569 A1 20001108; EP 1049569 A4 20030507; NZ 504591 A 20020426

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CETRAM PTY LIMITED

2004-09-15 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-05-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR