Global Patent Index - EP 1049583 A1

EP 1049583 A1 2000-11-08 - DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF A PAPER WEB

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR THE TREATMENT OF A PAPER WEB

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN EINER PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE FEUILLE CONTINUE DE PAPIER

Publication

EP 1049583 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966563 A

Priority

  • DE 9803754 W
  • DE 19757896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757896A1] The invention relates to a method for treating a paper web before printing. According to said method quality is improved by rolling particles adhering to the paper web into the surface of same, using, for example, a pair of calender rolls. The invention further relates to a corresponding device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/002 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01); Y10S 101/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933663A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757896 A1 19990708; EP 1049583 A1 20001108; EP 1049583 B1 20011128; EP 1132208 A2 20010912; EP 1132208 A3 20020220; EP 1132208 B1 20021204; JP 2001526991 A 20011225; JP 3343111 B2 20021111; US 6334390 B1 20020101; WO 9933663 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051222

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051222

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802277 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI