Global Patent Index - EP 1049588 A1

EP 1049588 A1 2000-11-08 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MULTILAYER PLASTIC IDENTITY CARD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A MULTILAYER PLASTIC IDENTITY CARD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN AUSWEISKARTE AUS KUNSTSTOFF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE DE LEGITIMATION MULTICOUCHE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1049588 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99963250 A

Priority

  • DE 9903640 W
  • DE 19853755 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7547045B2] A method for the production of a multi-layer identity card of plastic. The card to be produced comprises at least one card core layer printed on at least one side and on the printed side of the card core layer, a covering layer is applied.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/47 (2014.10); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 25/23 (2014.10); B42D 25/455 (2014.10); B42D 25/46 (2014.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0030864A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 2004075271 A1 20040422; US 7547045 B2 20090616; AT 287335 T 20050215; EP 1049588 A1 20001108; EP 1049588 B1 20050119; ES 2237195 T3 20050716; US 6817630 B1 20041116; WO 0030864 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-02-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MORPHO CARDS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20130122

2013-01-24 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MORPHO CARDS GMBH

- Effective date: 20130114

2012-11-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Document: AT 287335 T

- Effective date: 20121003

2012-11-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: MORPHO CARDS GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 287335 T

- Effective date: 20121003

2012-11-14 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-11-14 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121106

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM ORGA GMBH, LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, , DE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MORPHO CARDS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM ORGA GMBH, LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, , DE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: SAGEM ORGA GMBH, 33106 PADERBORN, DE; LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, 56567 NEUWIED, DE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MORPHO CARDS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: SAGEM ORGA GMBH, 33106 PADERBORN, DE; LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG, 56567 NEUWIED, DE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE PART GMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE PART GMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120725

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ SAGEM ORGA GMBH#AM HOPPENHOF 33#33104 PADERBORN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ MORPHO CARDS GMBH#KONRAD-ZUSE-RING 1#24220 FLINTBEK (DE)

2012-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH#AM HOPPENHOF 33#33104 PADERBORN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ SAGEM ORGA GMBH#AM HOPPENHOF 33#33104 PADERBORN (DE)

2012-07-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911491

- Representative's name: RICHARDT PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2009-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH#AM HOPPENHOF 33#33104 PADERBORN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG#IRLICHER STRASSE 55#56567 NEUWIED (DE) $ ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH#AM HOPPENHOF 33#33104 PADERBORN (DE)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LOHMANN G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ORGA KARTENSYSTEME G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-16 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237195 T3

2005-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH EN LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2005-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE ESTABLI

2005-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2005-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ORGA KARTENSYSTEME GMBH

2005-04-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911491 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOHMANN GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE