Global Patent Index - EP 1049614 A1

EP 1049614 A1 2000-11-08 - HYDRAULICALLY ACTIVATED WHEEL BRAKE WITH LOCKING FUNCTION

Title (en)

HYDRAULICALLY ACTIVATED WHEEL BRAKE WITH LOCKING FUNCTION

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCH BETÄTIGTE RADBREMSE MIT FESTSTELLFUNKTION

Title (fr)

FREIN HYDRAULIQUE POUR ROUE COMPORTANT UNE FONCTION DE BLOCAGE

Publication

EP 1049614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904813 A

Priority

  • DE 19802778 A
  • DE 19825683 A
  • EP 9900488 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937519A1] The invention relates to a hydraulically activated wheel brake (1) comprising at least one hydraulic piston (3) guided in the wheel brake housing (2), which for carrying out a locking function cooperates with an electromechanically actuated stopping device (4) which can be released from its actuated position by means of a quick-release device (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 17/16; F16D 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/16 (2006.01); F16D 65/14 (2006.01); F16D 65/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/16 (2013.01); F16D 65/18 (2013.01); F16D 2121/02 (2013.01); F16D 2121/14 (2013.01); F16D 2121/24 (2013.01); F16D 2123/00 (2013.01); F16D 2125/40 (2013.01); F16D 2125/60 (2013.01); F16D 2125/68 (2013.01); F16D 2127/04 (2013.01); F16D 2127/06 (2013.01); F16D 2129/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937519A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937519 A1 19990729; EP 1049614 A1 20001108; EP 1049614 B1 20040407

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090126

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909115 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT