Global Patent Index - EP 1049615 A1

EP 1049615 A1 2000-11-08 - A DEVICE FOR THE ESTIMATION OF THE LATERAL ACCELERATION OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR THE ESTIMATION OF THE LATERAL ACCELERATION OF A RAILWAY VEHICLE

Title (de)

EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSCHÄTZEN DER SEITLICHEN BESCHLEUNIGUNG EINES SCHIENENFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ESTIMER L'ACCELERATION LATERALE D'UN VEHICULE FERROVIAIRE

Publication

EP 1049615 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905403 A

Priority

  • SE 9900111 W
  • SE 9800217 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937520A1] The invention relies to a device for the estimation of the lateral acceleration of a rail-mounted vehicle in order to obtain a usable signal for applications which are controlled by the lateral acceleration, for example tilting of the car bodies of the rail-mounted vehicles in curves. The device comprises a measurement device (2) for measuring and outputting a measuring signal (5) in proportion to the value of the measured lateral acceleration and a filter device arranged to filter out disturbances (4) of said signal (5). The filter device comprises a first filter member (8) which is arranged to calculate an output signal (9, 12, 22) from the filter device by means of information about said disturbances (4) of the measuring signal (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/00; B60G 21/10; G01P 15/00; G05D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60G 17/019 (2006.01); B61F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/22 (2013.01); B60G 17/01908 (2013.01); B60G 2300/10 (2013.01); B60G 2400/104 (2013.01); B60G 2600/604 (2013.01); B60G 2800/012 (2013.01); B60G 2800/24 (2013.01); B60G 2800/702 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937520A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937520 A1 19990729; AT 270635 T 20040715; AU 2555599 A 19990809; AU 738437 B2 20010920; DE 69918530 D1 20040812; DE 69918530 T2 20050728; EP 1049615 A1 20001108; EP 1049615 B1 20040707; SE 511258 C2 19990906; SE 9800217 D0 19980127; SE 9800217 L 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130127

2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69918530

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 270635 T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080127

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080127

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041207

2007-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS ULRICH SEIFERT SEIFERT & PARTNER

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HANS ULRICH SEIFERT FELBER, SEIFERT & PARTNER

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918530 P 20040812

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI PT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI PT