Global Patent Index - EP 1049629 A1

EP 1049629 A1 2000-11-08 - FOLDING BOX WITH POUR SPOUT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

FOLDING BOX WITH POUR SPOUT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

FALTSCHACHTEL MIT SCHÜTTVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BOITE PLIANTE A BEC VERSEUR ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1049629 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902023 A

Priority

  • SE 9900038 W
  • SE 9800069 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938777A1] The invention relates to a folding box with a pouring spout and also a method of manufacturing such a folding box. The pouring spout is formed from part panels made in one piece with the folding box blank, comprising a front panel (38, 35) and a pair of flank panels (36, 37) connected thereto via fold indications (27, 28). At least one of the flank panels (36) initially lies essentially in the same plane as the front part (38, 35). The fold indication (27) of the flank panel has a material weakening in excess of that obtained by creasing or equivalent by virtue of its having been pre-folded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/744 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938777A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938777 A1 19990805; AT 238200 T 20030515; AU 2195499 A 19990816; DE 69907140 D1 20030528; DE 69907140 T2 20040205; DK 1049629 T3 20030804; EE 04226 B1 20040216; EE 200000424 A 20020215; EP 1049629 A1 20001108; EP 1049629 B1 20030423; ES 2198124 T3 20040116; HU 0100224 A2 20010528; HU 0100224 A3 20010828; NO 20003564 A 20000711; NO 20003564 D0 20000711; PL 341557 A1 20010423; RU 2233782 C2 20040810; SE 513514 C2 20000925; SE 9800069 D0 19980115; SE 9800069 L 19990716

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *A&R CARTON

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-08-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-01-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-01-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2006-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060114

2005-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050121

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198124 T3

2003-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907140 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE LI NL SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-04-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE LI NL SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000630;LV PAYMENT 20000630