Global Patent Index - EP 1049648 A1

EP 1049648 A1 2000-11-08 - LOW TEMPERATURE SENSITIVITY OXYGEN GENERATING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

LOW TEMPERATURE SENSITIVITY OXYGEN GENERATING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

SAUERSTOFF ERZEUGENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUREMPFINDLICHKEIT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS GENERANT DE L'OXYGENE SENSIBLES A BASSE TEMPERATURE

Publication

EP 1049648 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964140 A

Priority

  • US 9827088 W
  • US 1661098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938798A1] The oxygen generation compositions include about 0.5-15 % by weight of a substantially carbon-free metal fuel, and about 0.1-20 % by weight of alkali metal silicate, stannate, titanate or zirconate as a reaction rate and core rheology modifier and chlorine suppresser. The oxygen generating compositions also contain about 0.1-15 % by weight of a transition metal oxide catalyst; and the remainder is substantially an alkali metal chlorate or perchlorate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 13/0211 (2013.01); C01B 13/0218 (2013.01); C01B 13/0296 (2013.01); Y10S 149/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938798A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938798 A1 19990805; AU 1932999 A 19990816; AU 739293 B2 20011011; CA 2318810 A1 19990805; CA 2318810 C 20081118; DE 69817874 D1 20031009; DE 69817874 T2 20040519; EP 1049648 A1 20001108; EP 1049648 B1 20030903; US 2001030311 A1 20011018; US 6054067 A 20000425; US 6231816 B1 20010515; US 6352652 B2 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69817874

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020801

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE