Global patent index - EP 1049665 A1

EP 1049665 A1 2000-11-08 - VLA-4 ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

VLA-4 ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

VLA-4-ANTAGONISTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES D'ANTIGENE-4 D'ACTIVATION TRES TARDIVE (VLA-4)

Publication

EP 1049665 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908811 A

Priority

  • EP 9900384 W
  • US 1233698 A
  • US 11072398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937605A1] Compounds of formula (I) and their pharmaceutically acceptable salts are VLA-4 antagonists. They are useful in inhibiting cell adhesion and in the therapeutic or prophylactic treatment of inflammatory and autoimmune diseases, particularly inflammatory airways diseases. They are particularly useful in reducing post-surgical inflammation, especially that resulting from transplant surgery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 275/42; A61K 31/16; A61K 31/17; C07C 237/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61K 31/167 (2006.01); A61K 31/17 (2006.01); C07C 237/22 (2006.01); C07C 275/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 237/22 (2013.01); A61K 31/167 (2013.01); C07C 275/42 (2013.01); C07B 2200/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937605A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937605 A1 19990729; AU 2829299 A 19990809; AU 746174 B2 20020418; BR 9907733 A 20001017; CA 2318639 A1 19990729; CN 1294576 A 20010509; EE 200000428 A 20011217; EP 1049665 A1 20001108; HU 0100336 A2 20010730; HU 0100336 A3 20021128; ID 26665 A 20010125; IL 137329 D0 20010724; JP 2002501039 A 20020115; JP 4564654 B2 20101020; NO 20003694 A 20000920; NO 20003694 D0 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033825

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020206

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVARTIS-ERFINDUNGEN VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000719;LV PAYMENT 20000719;SI PAYMENT 20000719