Global patent index - EP 1049705 A1

EP 1049705 A1 2000-11-08 - METALLOCENE MONOHALOGENIDES

Title (en)

METALLOCENE MONOHALOGENIDES

Title (de)

METALLOCENMONOHALOGENIDE

Title (fr)

MONOHALOGENURES DE METALLOCENE

Publication

EP 1049705 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99956012 A

Priority

  • DE 19854350 A
  • EP 9908851 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0031090A1] The invention relates to new metallocene monohalogenides, a method for producing same and their use in the polymerisation of olefins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 17/00; C08F 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 7/08 (2006.01); C07F 7/00 (2006.01); C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/62 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 10/06 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01); C08F 110/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 10/00 (2013.01); C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/06 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65916 (2013.01); C08F 110/06 (2013.01); Y10S 526/941 (2013.01); Y10S 526/943 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/65927
  2. C08F 10/06 + C08F 4/65927
  3. C08F 110/06 + C08F 2500/15

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031090A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0031090 A1 20000602; AU 1272100 A 20000613; BR 9906934 A 20001010; BR 9906934 B1 20100824; CN 100340568 C 20071003; CN 1289337 A 20010328; DE 59914158 D1 20070308; EP 1049705 A1 20001108; EP 1396495 A1 20040310; EP 1396495 B1 20070117; ES 2280674 T3 20070916; JP 2002530415 A 20020917; JP 5008794 B2 20120822; KR 100635413 B1 20061018; US 7053160 B1 20060530; ZA 200003597 B 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000722

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE