Global patent index - EP 1049708 A1

EP 1049708 A1 2000-11-08 - METH1 AND METH2 POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (en)

METH1 AND METH2 POLYNUCLEOTIDES AND POLYPEPTIDES

Title (de)

METH1- UND METH2- POLYNUKLEOTIDE UND POLYPEPTIDE

Title (fr)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES ET POLYPEPTIDES METH1 ET METH2

Publication

EP 1049708 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904190 A

Priority

  • US 9901313 W
  • US 7229898 P
  • US 9853998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937660A1] The present invention relates to novel anti-angiogenic proteins, related to thrombospondin. More specifically, isolated nucleic acid molecules are provided encoding human METH1 and METH2. METH1 and METH2 polypeptides are also provided, as are vectors, host cells and recombinant methods for producing the same. Also provided are diagnostic methods for the prognosis of cancer and therapeutic methods for treating individuals in need of an increased amount of METH1 or METH2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/47; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/78 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937660 A1 19990729; WO 9937660 A9 19991014; AU 2464199 A 19990809; AU 766787 B2 20031023; CA 2319109 A1 19990729; CN 1292796 A 20010425; EP 1049708 A1 20001108; EP 1049708 A4 20020904; JP 2002501077 A 20020115; MX PA00007165 A 20020621; NZ 505855 A 20050128

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032596

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-05-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060317

2002-09-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07H 21/04 A, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 1/21 B, 7C 12N 15/85 B, 7C 12N 9/64 B

2001-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: IRUELA-ARISPE, LUISA

2001-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HASTINGS, GREGG, A.

2001-09-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUBEN, STEVEN, M.

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE