Global Patent Index - EP 1049714 A1

EP 1049714 A1 2000-11-08 - SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (en)

SECRETED PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM

Title (de)

SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE UND DIE DAFÜR KODIERENDEN POLYNUKLEOTIDE

Title (fr)

PROTEINES SECRETEES ET POLYNUCLEOTIDES LES CODANT

Publication

EP 1049714 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904216 A

Priority

  • US 9901404 W
  • US 7213498 P
  • US 23560999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937674A1] Novel polynucleotides and the proteins encoded thereby are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; C07K 7/06; C07K 14/00; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/04 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937674 A1 19990729; AU 2466499 A 19990809; CA 2318303 A1 19990729; EP 1049714 A1 20001108; EP 1049714 A4 20030122; JP 2002508936 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-01-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021205

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GENETICS INSTITUTE, LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOBS, KENNETH

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCOY, JOHN, M.

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAVALLIE, EDWARD, R.

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLINS-RACIE, LISA, A.

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MERBERG, DAVID

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TREACY, MAURICE

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEININGER, ROBERT, J., II

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JACOBS, KENNETH

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MCCOY, JOHN, M.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LAVALLIE, EDWARD, R.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: COLLINS-RACIE, LISA, A.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MERBERG, DAVID

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TREACY, MAURICE

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AGOSTINO, MICHAEL, J.

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEININGER, ROBERT, J., II

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE