Global Patent Index - EP 1049736 A1

EP 1049736 A1 2000-11-08 - COMPOUND CAPABLE OF TRAPPING METAL IONS, METHOD FOR UTILIZING THEM AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

COMPOUND CAPABLE OF TRAPPING METAL IONS, METHOD FOR UTILIZING THEM AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM ABFANGEN VON METALLIONEN, VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE ANWENDUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSES SUSCEPTIBLES DE PIEGER LES IONS METALLIQUES, PROCEDE LES METTANT EN OEUVRE, ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1049736 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900962 A

Priority

  • FR 9900103 W
  • FR 9800547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773808A1] Compounds that are capable of trapping metal ions are: (a) Polyamines obtained by reaction of a diamine (1) with a crosslinking agent; (b) a mixture of such polyamines; and (c) a conjugate of two diamines or polyamines as described linked directly or through a succinic or glutaric anhydride residue. The diamine or mixture of diamines used to prepare the polyamines are of formula H2N-A-NR1 (1) A = 1-6C alkylene or alkylidene optionally substituted by one or more carboxyl groups, -(CH2)n-CO-, -CO-(CH2)n-, -(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-, or -(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-; n = 1 - 6; R1 = H, 1-6C alkyl optionally substituted by one or more carboxyl groups and/or an imidazolyl. The diamine may also be one prepared by polymerization of a molecule carrying an amine function and an aldehyde function protected by acetal formation, or by reduction of a polyamide. The conjugates of two diamines or polyamines are of formula X-Y-Zp X and Z = a diamine of formula (1) or a polyamine or mixture of polyamines as defined, or Z may also be a carrier molecule such as polylysine or bovine seric albumin; Y = a direct bond or a succinic or glutaric anhydride residue; p = 1 - 3 such that when X is a succinic or glutaric residue and X is (1), then A = alkylene, -(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-, or -(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-NH-(CH2)n-; and R1 = H, or A = -(CH2)2-CO- and R1 = (imidazol-5-yl)carboxymethyl. An Independent claim is included for a method of recovering metal ions from solution comprising contacting the solution of metal ions with a compounds as described to form a complex, passing the complex through a filtration means to retain or filter the complex, and recovering the metal ions by acid treatment of the retained or filtered complex.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 73/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 73/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 73/0206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936460A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773808 A1 19990723; FR 2773808 B1 20000505; EP 1049736 A1 20001108; WO 9936460 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033833

2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-07-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOUNDS CAPABLE OF TRAPPING METAL IONS, METHOD FOR UTILIZING THEM AND THEIR USE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE