Global patent index - EP 1049817 A1

EP 1049817 A1 2000-11-08 - SLURRY FOR COATING NON-CARBON METAL-BASED ANODES FOR ALUMINIUM PRODUCTION CELLS

Title (en)

SLURRY FOR COATING NON-CARBON METAL-BASED ANODES FOR ALUMINIUM PRODUCTION CELLS

Title (de)

AUFSCHLÄMMUNG ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON KOHLENSTOFFFREIEN ANODEN AUF METALLBASIS FÜR ZELLEN ZUR ALUMINIUMHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COULIS DE REVETEMENT D'ANODES METALLIQUES EXEMPTES DE CARBONE POUR CELLULES DE PRODUCTION D'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1049817 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900109 A

Priority

  • IB 9900081 W
  • IB 9800081 W
  • US 12635998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9936593A1] A method of coating an electronically conductive and heat resistant substrate of an anode of a cell for the electrowinning of metals, in particular a cell for the electrowinning of aluminium, to protect and make the surface of the anode active for the oxidation of the oxygen ions present in the electrolyte. The method comprises applying onto the substrate a slurry comprising at least one oxide or oxide precursor as a non-dispersed but suspended particulate in a colloidal and/or inorganic polymeric carrier. The applied-slurry is then solidified and made adherent to the substrate upon heat treatment to form an adherent, protective, predominantly oxide-containing coating. The colloidal and/or inorganic polymeric carrier may comprise at least one of alumina, ceria, lithia, magnesia, silica, thoria, yttria, zirconia, tin oxide and zinc oxide. The oxide of the coating may be a chromite or a ferrite, such as a ferrite selected from cobalt, copper, manganese, nickel and zinc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/12; C25C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/12 (2006.01); C25C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 7/025 (2013.01); C25C 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936593A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9936593 A1 19990722; AU 1779799 A 19990802; AU 747903 B2 20020530; CA 2317802 A1 19990722; CA 2317802 C 20080401; DE 69933854 D1 20061214; DE 69933854 T2 20070531; EP 1049817 A1 20001108; EP 1049817 B1 20061102; ES 2274613 T3 20070516; NO 20003702 A 20000719; NO 20003702 D0 20000719; NO 326358 B1 20081117

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140119

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69933854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140119

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69933854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130128

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: RIO TINTO ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LTD., MONTREAL, CA

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69933854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110816

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69933854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BEETZ & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110816

2011-05-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: RIO TINTO ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-01-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101223 AND 20101229

2011-01-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2011-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-12-15 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20101125

2010-12-15 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20101125

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070119

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2274613

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69933854

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOLTECH INVENT S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020306

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL