Global patent index - EP 1049834 A1

EP 1049834 A1 2000-11-08 - SAFETY DEVICE FOR THE CONTROL ELEMENTS OF A MANUALLY OPERATED SOIL COMPACTION ROLLER

Title (en)

SAFETY DEVICE FOR THE CONTROL ELEMENTS OF A MANUALLY OPERATED SOIL COMPACTION ROLLER

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSANORDNUNG FÜR DIE BEDIENUNGSELEMENTE EINER HANDGEFÜHRTEN BODENVERDICHTUNGSWALZE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE POUR LES ELEMENTS DE COMMANDE D'UN ROULEAU DE COMPACTAGE DU SOL A COMMANDE MANUELLE

Publication

EP 1049834 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903613 A

Priority

  • DE 19802007 A
  • EP 9900079 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937862A1] The invention relates to a safety device for a manually operated soil compaction roller, comprising an operating lever (3) and an adjusting element (7) coupled to an actuator (9) in order to drive said roller. In case of danger, a safety-control element (12,13) travels in between the adjusting element (7) and the operating lever (3) and separates the positive coupling (6), whereupon the adjusting element (7) swings into a neutral position and shuts down the machine. When the operating lever swings forwards, a command corresponding to a forward movement is transmitted to the drive mechanism of said roller via a second positive coupling (17, 18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/26; E01C 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/26 (2006.01); E01C 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/283 (2013.01); E01C 19/262 (2013.01); Y10T 74/20049 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2014 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937862A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937862 A1 19990729; DE 19802007 C1 19991111; EP 1049834 A1 20001108; EP 1049834 B1 20030402; ES 2193682 T3 20031101; JP 2002501135 A 20020115; JP 3980830 B2 20070926; US 6382383 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140109

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-09-23 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120426 AND 20120502

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59904842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-01-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111205

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-12-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-12-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2193682

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI SE