Global Patent Index - EP 1049844 A1

EP 1049844 A1 2000-11-08 - REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

FERNSTEUEREINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMANDE

Publication

EP 1049844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907385 A

Priority

  • AT 9298 A
  • EP 9900316 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937873A1] The invention relates to a remote control device for controlling at least one function in access devices having several types of transmitters (1-5) and one type of receiver (10), whereby the receiver (10) cooperates with the access device. Each transmitter has a storage device to store a system identification word and a serial number as well as a coder to code a send signal by means of an algorithm known per se and using a system identification word (SI1-SI5) and a serial number. A different system identification word and a different range of serial numbers are assigned to each type of transmitter (SI2-SI5). The receiver (10) of a given type has a storage device to store the system identification words and the serial number ranges of all types of transmitters as well as a decoder to decode the send signals received using the algorithm. At least one tuning unit is provided in the receiver to tune one or more transmitters and the receiver by transmitting and storing the serial number in the receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00253 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937873A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937873 A1 19990729; AT 237061 T 20030415; AT A9298 A 20001015; AU 2717599 A 19990809; BR 9907204 A 20001017; CA 2319250 A1 19990729; DE 59904945 D1 20030515; EP 1049844 A1 20001108; EP 1049844 B1 20030409; ES 2196777 T3 20031216; JP 2002501360 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59904945

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110923

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2005-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAGNA AUTECA A.G.

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-01-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196777 T3

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAGNA AUTECA AG

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7G 07C 9/00 B

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010712

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE