Global Patent Index - EP 1049849 A1

EP 1049849 A1 2000-11-08 - SLIDE ROD LOCKING SYSTEM

Title (en)

SLIDE ROD LOCKING SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHUBSTANGENVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE A BARRE COULISSANTE

Publication

EP 1049849 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965800 A

Priority

  • DE 19801721 A
  • EP 9808033 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801721C1] The invention relates to a slide rod locking system, especially for locking the door of a switchgear cabinet, comprising a handle (20) which is coupled to a control element by means of a control mechanism (10, 15). Said handle (20) can move around a pivotal axis (10, 14) running perpendicular to the plane of the cabinet door. The control element (10, 15) can move in a parallel position in relation to the plane of the cabinet door (30) as a result of the movement of the handle (20). The inventive slide rod locking system transmits powerful locking forces and at the same time can be provided with a low-height design structure by arranging a lever (10, 9) on the articulated joint (10, 12) of the handle (20) at a distance from the pivotal axis (10, 14). Said lever enables the force introduced into the handle (20) to be transmitted to the control element (10, 15) and can modify its angle position with respect to the handle (20) when the latter moves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 13/00 (2006.01); E05B 5/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); H05K 5/03 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2013.01); E05B 1/0092 (2013.01); E05B 5/003 (2013.01); E05B 13/002 (2013.01); E05C 9/046 (2013.01); Y10S 292/53 (2013.01); Y10T 292/0845 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1015 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936654A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801721 C1 19990429; EP 1049849 A1 20001108; EP 1049849 B1 20080416; JP 2002509216 A 20020326; JP 3589982 B2 20041117; US 6497437 B1 20021224; WO 9936654 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2007-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070514

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT