Global Patent Index - EP 1049857 A1

EP 1049857 A1 2000-11-08 - DEVICE FOR INTERRUPTING THE POWER FLUX BETWEEN AT LEAST ONE VALVE AND AT LEAST ONE CAM OF A CAMSHAFT

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INTERRUPTING THE POWER FLUX BETWEEN AT LEAST ONE VALVE AND AT LEAST ONE CAM OF A CAMSHAFT

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERBRECHUNG DES KRAFTFLUSSES ZWISCHEN WENIGSTENS EINEM VENTIL UND WENIGSTENS EINEM NOCKEN EINER NOCKENWELLE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'INTERRUPTION DU FLUX DE FORCE ENTRE AU MOINS UNE SOUPAPE ET AU MOINS UNE CAME D'UN ARBRE A CAMES

Publication

EP 1049857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965861 A

Priority

  • DE 19801964 A
  • EP 9808378 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801964A1] The system to interrupt the force flow between at least one motor valve and at least one cam at the camshaft, in an internal combustion motor, has an initial operating lever (5) on at least one standing compensation unit (8), with the swing axis (9) for the mounting of the second operating lever (6). The rotating coupling (7) is mounted to the second operating lever (6), which lies on at least one cam (3) on the camshaft (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0005 (2013.01); F01L 1/185 (2013.01); F01L 2820/031 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937894A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801964 A1 19990722; EP 1049857 A1 20001108; EP 1049857 B1 20021023; JP 2002501140 A 20020115; US 6318317 B1 20011120; WO 9937894 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081221

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081221

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20080412

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000701

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB