Global Patent Index - EP 1049860 A1

EP 1049860 A1 2000-11-08 - FUEL INJECTION PUMP

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION PUMP

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1049860 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964368 A

Priority

  • DE 9903722 W
  • DE 19854766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854766A1] Disclosed is a fuel injection pump with a cam drive and an injection-adjusting piston which acts upon the cam drive in order to time the beginning of the injection. Said piston comprises at least one pressure chamber (17) at its face end. Said pressure chamber can either be connected to a pressure source (38) having a discharge line (36) via a control valve (29) or can be completely closed, whereby the control valve is actuated by an electromagnet, preferably a proportional electromagnet. High efficiency of the timing of the beginning of the injection is thereby achieved with little need for adjusting means; the advantage is that the injection-adjusting piston (15) is only axially charged and that friction forces are thus eliminated at the circumference of the injection-adjusting piston.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 1/18; F02M 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 1/18 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02M 41/12 (2006.01); F02M 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 41/1416 (2013.01); F02D 1/183 (2013.01); F02D 2001/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0032919A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854766 A1 20000531; EP 1049860 A1 20001108; EP 1049860 B1 20050427; JP 2002531747 A 20020924; PL 341910 A1 20010507; US 6413054 B1 20020702; WO 0032919 A1 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911983

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101124

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050815

2005-06-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911983 P 20050602

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE