Global Patent Index - EP 1049861 A1

EP 1049861 A1 2000-11-08 - LEAN REGENERATION OF NOx STORAGE UNITS

Title (en)

LEAN REGENERATION OF NOx STORAGE UNITS

Title (de)

MAGER-REGENERATION VON NOx-SPEICHERN

Title (fr)

REGENERATION D'ACCUMULATEURS DE NOx DE MOTEURS A MELANGE PAUVRE

Publication

EP 1049861 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965852 A

Priority

  • DE 19801815 A
  • EP 9808290 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19801815A1] A lean-burn internal combustion engine exhaust gas cleaning process comprises alternate exposure of catalyst portions to rich and lean exhaust gas in a relatively oxygen-rich exhaust gas. An exhaust gas cleaning process, for a lean-burn, lambda regulated internal combustion (i.c) engine with a NOx storage catalyst and a lambda probe, comprises exposing each volume element of the catalyst at alternating times and locations to rich and lean exhaust gas when the exhaust gas is a stoichiometric or lean exhaust gas with relatively high oxygen concentration. The lambda value preferably oscillates about a mean value lambda m of \-1, the oscillation being a sinusoidal or triangular oscillation of variable amplitude and/or frequency and the frequency being \-0.1 Hz. The mean value lambda m is generated by cylinder-selective regulation of the engine, in which some of the cylinders are operated with different rich lambda values and the others are operated with different lean lambda values. Regulation of the lean exhaust gas is achieved by changing the fuel reduction rate or by varying the dead times of the injected quantity changes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/02; F01N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02B 1/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/0082 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 3/0871 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02B 1/04 (2013.01); F02D 41/1408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936689A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19801815 A1 19990722; EP 1049861 A1 20001108; EP 1049861 B1 20021016; WO 9936689 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TEGEL & MEYER, DE

2014-07-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-10-20 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110716

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20021016

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-01-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-21

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010626

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE