Global Patent Index - EP 1049862 A1

EP 1049862 A1 2000-11-08 - DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING RICHNESS IN AN INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ESTIMATING RICHNESS IN AN INJECTION SYSTEM FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG DES LUFT/KRAFTSTOFFVERHÄLTNISSES FÜR EIN KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEM EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE RICHESSE DE SYSTEME D'INJECTION POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1049862 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900932 A

Priority

  • FR 9900072 W
  • FR 9800502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2773847A1] The device is designed to estimate the fuel mixture richness admitted in each of n combustion chambers (n being a whole number greater than 1), of an engine having injectors in the cylinders. The device includes: - a sensor (26) providing an output signal which varies sensibly linearly with the fuel mixture richness. The sensor is placed at the point of merging of the exhaust of the n chambers, and; - a computer for: - memorizing a model of the behavior at the exhaust merging point, based upon a hypothesis of the richness at the exhaust point, where the air/fuel relationship is a weighted sum of the contribution of the exhaust of the individual chambers. The weighting coefficient being lower than that of the combustion in the first chamber to fire, and; - to estimate, after each passage from top dead center, the air/fuel relationship from the values measured and from the model. The model includes a particular sub-model by combustion chamber, having for the chamber of order I, a Kalman (RTM) filter having an m,n matrix with coefficients Cij and it own Kij gains matrix, I being equal to (1.......n) and corresponding to the chamber number and j going from 1 to m corresponding to the number of the weighted coefficient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/1401 (2013.01); F02D 41/1439 (2013.01); F02D 41/1481 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1409 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1416 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1417 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1418 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1433 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9936690A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2773847 A1 19990723; FR 2773847 B1 20000324; BR 9907102 A 20001024; BR 9907102 B1 20120207; DE 69902992 D1 20021024; DE 69902992 T2 20030528; EP 1049862 A1 20001108; EP 1049862 B1 20020918; JP 2002527657 A 20020827; US 6357429 B1 20020319; WO 9936690 A1 19990722

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-11-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAGEM S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902992

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-24

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010822

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE