Global Patent Index - EP 1049866 A1

EP 1049866 A1 2000-11-08 - AIR FILTER FITTED WITH A SILENCER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

AIR FILTER FITTED WITH A SILENCER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

MIT DÄMPFERGLIED VERSEHENES LUFTFILTER ZU BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

FILTRE A AIR DOTE D'UN ORGANE AMORTISSEUR ET DESTINE A DES MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1049866 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99901801 A

Priority

  • HU 9900005 W
  • HU 9800102 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9937906A1] An air filter fitted with a silencer for internal combustion engines comprises a housing (1) with an atmospheric air intake pipe (6) and a purified air discharge pipe (8), and a filter insert (4) that can be placed in the housing (1). The intake pipe (6) is arranged in the vicinity of one of the end faces of the housing (1), on the outer side wall of the housing (1). The invention essentially consists in that one or several silencer inserts (3) with diffuser openings widening in the direction of the discharge pipe (8), preferably so as to fill the whole cross section of the housing (1), are arranged in the part of the housing (1) located between the air filter insert (4) and the discharge pipe (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2013.01); F02M 35/0207 (2013.01); F02M 35/02483 (2013.01); F02M 35/1211 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937906A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9937906 A1 19990729; AT 237077 T 20030415; AU 2179899 A 19990809; DE 59904946 D1 20030515; EP 1049866 A1 20001108; EP 1049866 B1 20030409; HU 222975 B1 20040128; HU 9800102 A1 19990928; HU 9800102 D0 19980330

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-01-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-03-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-02-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020604

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB IT