Global Patent Index - EP 1049868 A1

EP 1049868 A1 2000-11-08 - PUMP SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING FUEL AT HIGH PRESSURE

Title (en)

PUMP SYSTEM FOR SUPPLYING FUEL AT HIGH PRESSURE

Title (de)

PUMPENANORDNUNG ZUR KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE POMPES POUR ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT SOUS HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1049868 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906058 A

Priority

  • DE 9900088 W
  • DE 19802476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802476A1] The pump fitting has a casing (2) including several pump elements in which fuel is subjected to high pressure and taken to a common rail high pressure connection boring (8). The system includes several high pressure channels (6, 7) connected to the pump elements and lying in a different plane to the high pressure connection boring at which they meet. At least one channel may pass tangentially through the boring to the outside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/08; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/08 (2013.01); F02M 59/06 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F04B 53/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802476 A1 19990729; EP 1049868 A1 20001108; EP 1049868 B1 20020508; JP 2002501144 A 20020115; JP 4372999 B2 20091125; US 6588405 B1 20030708; WO 9937910 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901391

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110118

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110118

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901391

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010813

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT