Global Patent Index - EP 1049869 A1

EP 1049869 A1 2000-11-08 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A VARIABLE VOLUMETRIC FLOW IN A FUEL SUPPLY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A VARIABLE VOLUMETRIC FLOW IN A FUEL SUPPLY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES VARIABLEN VOLUMENSTROMES BEI EINER KRAFTSTOFFZUFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN DEBIT VARIABLE DANS UNE ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1049869 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99960884 A

Priority

  • DE 9903581 W
  • DE 19854509 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854509A1] Disclosed is a device for producing a variable volumetric flow in a fuel supply, comprising a high-pressure pump (21). Said pressure pump (21) comprises at least one supply, at least one cylinder (21b), at least one piston which can move in said cylinder and a shaft (1) which drives the piston (21a) or the pistons. The device also comprises a dosing device (2-8) which is arranged in the supply or the supplies of the high-pressure pump (21) and which is synchronized in the shaft (1). Said dosing device (2-8) feeds a fuel volume having variable doses to the cylinder (21b) or the cylinders every time the shaft (1) rotates, whereby the dosing is carried out by changing the opening and closing angle of the supply or the supplies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/20; F02M 41/06; F02M 59/36; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 41/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/20 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/363 (2013.01); F02M 41/063 (2013.01); F02M 59/205 (2013.01); F02M 59/362 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031409A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854509 A1 20000608; DE 19854509 C2 20001123; EP 1049869 A1 20001108; EP 1049869 B1 20040225; US 6293250 B1 20010925; US RE38192 E 20030722; WO 0031409 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908649 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE