Global Patent Index - EP 1049871 A1

EP 1049871 A1 2000-11-08 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1049871 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99953590 A

Priority

  • DE 9902657 W
  • DE 19838949 A
  • DE 19927196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6296199B1] A fuel-injection valve, in particular, a high-pressure injection valve, for injecting fuel directly into a combustion chamber of a mixture-compressing internal combustion engine with externally supplied ignition is distinguished by the fact that a guide and seating area formed by three disc-shaped elements is provided at a downstream end of the valve. A swirl element is embedded between a guide element and a valve seat element. The guide element is used to guide a valve needle which passes through it and can move in the axial direction, while a valve closing segment of the valve interacts with a valve seat surface of the valve seat element. The swirl element has an inner opening area with multiple swirl channels. The three disc-shaped elements are permanently connected to each other, forming a positive-locking joint.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/162 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0012891A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6296199 B1 20011002; AU 1028700 A 20000321; AU 741787 B2 20011206; BR 9906683 A 20001017; CN 1104555 C 20030402; CN 1275185 A 20001129; EP 1049871 A1 20001108; EP 1049871 B1 20030730; ES 2205895 T3 20040501; JP 2002523682 A 20020730; JP 4593784 B2 20101208; RU 2227226 C2 20040420; WO 0012891 A1 20000309

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150825

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150825

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150825

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140819

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205895

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906432

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE