Global Patent Index - EP 1049873 A1

EP 1049873 A1 2000-11-08 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR PRODUCING HIGH PRESSURE FUEL

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR PRODUCING HIGH PRESSURE FUEL

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE ZUR KRAFSTOFFHOCHDRUCKERZEUGUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTON RADIAL POUR PRODUCTION DE HAUTE PRESSION POUR CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1049873 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904708 A

Priority

  • DE 9900056 W
  • DE 19802475 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802475A1] The pump has a drive shaft (51) in a casing (50). The shaft is eccentric or has cam-like protuberances on its circumference. There are several pistons fitted radially relative to the drive shaft, each in a cylinder cavity (56). A plate (58) is against the piston end facing the drive shaft. As the drive shaft is rotated, the pistons are moved translationally and reciprocally in their cylinder cavities. The plate is pivoted to the appropriate piston.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01); F04B 53/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802475 A1 19990729; EP 1049873 A1 20001108; EP 1049873 B1 20020724; JP 2002501145 A 20020115; US 6347574 B1 20020219; WO 9937916 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902114

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110115

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110115

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110115

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902114 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT