Global Patent Index - EP 1049874 A1

EP 1049874 A1 2000-11-08 - AXIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (en)

AXIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (de)

AXIALKOLBENPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS AXIAUX

Publication

EP 1049874 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903678 A

Priority

  • DE 19803533 A
  • EP 9900448 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803533A1] The invention relates to an axial piston pump comprising a pump housing (1), a motor-driven shaft (2), a swash plate (3) connected to the shaft (2) in a rotationally fixed manner, and a number of pistons (4). The swash plate (3) permits the pistons to move in a back and forward manner. According to the invention, the axial piston pump is configured in such a way that the shaft (2) extends through the pump housing (1), and the swash plate (3) is arranged outside said pump housing (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 17/00 (2006.01); F04B 1/14 (2006.01); F04B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939100A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803533 A1 19990805; EP 1049874 A1 20001108; EP 1049874 B1 20030502; JP 2002502007 A 20020122; WO 9939100 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20110624

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-06-24 [REG DE R231] PATENT ABANDONED FOR DE

- Document: DE 59905314

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110209

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905314 P 20030605

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010917

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB