Global Patent Index - EP 1049876 A1

EP 1049876 A1 2000-11-08 - GEAR PUMP

Title (en)

GEAR PUMP

Title (de)

ZAHNRADPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A ENGRENAGES

Publication

EP 1049876 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98961048 A

Priority

  • DE 9803135 W
  • DE 19802137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802137C1] A gear pump (11) comprising a gearwheel (14) with external toothing and an annular gear (15) with internal toothing which is guided into the cylindrical recess (18) of a housing (12) and which, together with the gearwheel (14), rotates around its own respective staggered axis. The inventive gear pump (11) is fitted with an aspirating hole (31) and a kidney-shaped pressure hole (32) in a first side wall of the housing defining the recess (18). A hollow cone-shaped indentation (38) is also provided in a second wall of the housing (12) opposite the pressure hole (32). The hollow cone (38) is fluidly connected to the pressure hole (32) and facilitates the formation of a fluid film between the annular ring (15) and the housing (12), thereby improving the gear pump's (11) resistance to wear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10; F04C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01); F04C 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/06 (2013.01); F04C 2/086 (2013.01); F04C 15/0042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937922A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802137 C1 19990304; EP 1049876 A1 20001108; EP 1049876 B1 20020724; JP 2002501147 A 20020115; US 6280167 B1 20010828; WO 9937922 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141027

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141027

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021003

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804939 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011010

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB