Global patent index - EP 1049984 A1

EP 1049984 A1 2000-11-08 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLIENT-SERVER INTERACTION IN INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CLIENT-SERVER INTERACTION IN INTERACTIVE COMMUNICATIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR KUNDENSERVER-INTERAKTION IN INTERAKTIVEN KOMMUNIKATIONEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INTERACTION ENTRE CLIENT ET SERVEUR DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS INTERACTIVES

Publication

EP 1049984 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904489 A

Priority

  • US 9902063 W
  • US 7320398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939272A1] In an interactive communication system based on MPEG-4, Command descriptors along with Command Route nodes or Server Routes in the scene description can be used to support application-specific interactivity. Content selection can be supported by specifying the presentation in command parameters, with the command ID indicating that the command is a content selection command. An initial scene can be created with several images and with text that describes a presentation associated with an image. Associated with each image and the corresponding text is a content selection descriptor. When a user clicks on an image, the client transmits the command containing the selected presentation and the server starts a new presentation. The technique can be used in any application context, as generally as HTTP and CGI can be used to implement any server-based application functionality.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/00; G06F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/6587 (2013.01); H04N 21/23412 (2013.01); H04N 21/44012 (2013.01); H04N 21/47205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939272 A1 19990805; AU 2487799 A 19990816; CA 2319820 A1 19990805; CN 100383764 C 20080423; CN 1295689 A 20010516; EP 1049984 A1 20001108; EP 1049984 A4 20030917; JP 2002502169 A 20020122; JP 4194240 B2 20081210

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070219

2003-09-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/00 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/14 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/24 B

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KALVA, HARI

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ELEFTHERIADIS, ALEXANDROS

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE