Global Patent Index - EP 1049990 A1

EP 1049990 A1 2000-11-08 - DATABASE APPARATUS

Title (en)

DATABASE APPARATUS

Title (de)

DATENBANK-APPARAT

Title (fr)

BASE DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1049990 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99901096 A

Priority

  • IL 9900038 W
  • IL 9800029 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938094A1] A database file management system for accessing data records is being executed on data processing system, the data records are linked to a trie index that is arranged in blocks (402, 405, 406 and 407) and being stored in a storage medium. The trie index (A, B and I, element 402) enables accessing or updating the data records by key or keys and being susceptible to an unbalanced structure of blocks. There is provided a method for constructing a layered index arranged in blocks, which includes the steps of providing the trie index and constructing a representative index over the representative keys of the trie index. The layered index enables accessing or updating the data records by key or keys and it constitutes a balanced structure of blocks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30327 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938094 A1 19990729; AU 2071999 A 19990809; AU 759360 B2 20030410; BR 9907227 A 20010904; CA 2319177 A1 19990729; CN 1292901 A 20010425; EP 1049990 A1 20001108; EP 1049990 A4 20040908; HU 0101298 A2 20010828; HU 0101298 A3 20030728; JP 2002501256 A 20020115; NO 20003759 A 20000920; NO 20003759 D0 20000721; NZ 505767 A 20030926; RU 2000122092 A 20020727; TR 200002119 T2 20001221

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20150316

2015-03-16 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2008-08-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033010

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050823

2004-09-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040728

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000819;LT PAYMENT 20000819;LV PAYMENT 20000819;MK PAYMENT 20000819;RO PAYMENT 20000819;SI PAYMENT 20000819