Global Patent Index - EP 1050021 A1

EP 1050021 A1 2000-11-08 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE VALIDATION OF TICKETS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR THE VALIDATION OF TICKETS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GÜLTIGMACHEN VON FAHRKARTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE VALIDATION DE TICKETS

Publication

EP 1050021 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99906150 A

Priority

  • EP 9900273 W
  • IT PI980006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938122A1] A method and an apparatus for the validation of travel documents, such as for example paper tickets (1) for public transport vehicles, wherein a first validation action comprises the step of printing (13) coded data (5) such as date and time, which can be read during a second validation action by optical means. In the same way, always at the first validation, further coded data (6) can be printed on the ticket such as for example information relative to the validating apparatus that is carrying out the printing. Moreover, on the unused ticket coded data (3, 4) can be pre-printed such as for example the maximum mileage, etc. All the information can be read by each apparatus after each new validation attempt so that the machine can record such data, or, alternatively, can refuse the validation of the ticket and call the attention of an inspector in case the ticket were found to be irregular.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 11/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 11/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 11/03 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938122 A1 19990729; AU 2618599 A 19990809; DE 69918406 D1 20040805; EP 1050021 A1 20001108; EP 1050021 B1 20040630; IT 1306105 B1 20010529; IT PI980006 A1 19990721; IT PI980006 D0 19980121

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-04 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100319

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-06-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ERG LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-05-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ERG LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918406 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL PT

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021204

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL PT