Global Patent Index - EP 1050046 A2

EP 1050046 A2 2000-11-08 - METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING A KEY

Title (en)

METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR GENERATING A KEY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SCHLÜSSELWORTES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR GENERER UNE CLE

Publication

EP 1050046 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99969906 A

Priority

  • EP 99969906 A
  • EP 9908631 W
  • EP 98203890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0030100A2] Method and read and/or write apparatus for generating a key (18) to control the access to information present on an information carrier (1). The key comprises a M-bit master key (12) and an information carrier key (2). The apparatus is adapted to read and/or write information on an information carrier (1). The apparatus is further adapted to generate the M-bit master key (12). The information carrier key (2) is read from the information carrier. The M-bit master key (12) is derived by determining a number p based on an identifier R and by reading out an N-bit string (11) from a position defined by the number p. In this way it is possible to prevent illegal copying of information from one information carrier to another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/0021 (2013.01); G11B 20/00086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0030100A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0030100 A2 20000525; WO 0030100 A3 20000817; AU 3148400 A 20000605; CN 1153208 C 20040609; CN 1296619 A 20010523; EP 1050046 A2 20001108; IL 137335 A 20040328; IL 137335 D0 20010724; JP 2003524922 A 20030819; TR 200002086 T1 20021223; TW 430783 B 20010421; US 6457127 B1 20020924; ZA 200003612 B 20011018

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033498

2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041102

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE