Global Patent Index - EP 1050058 A1

EP 1050058 A1 2000-11-08 - VACUUM INTERRUPTER CHAMBER WITH A RING-SHAPED ISOLATOR

Title (en)

VACUUM INTERRUPTER CHAMBER WITH A RING-SHAPED ISOLATOR

Title (de)

VAKUUMSCHALTKAMMER MIT RINGFÖRMIGEM ISOLATOR

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE D'INTERRUPTEUR A VIDE A ISOLATEUR ANNULAIRE

Publication

EP 1050058 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907276 A

Priority

  • DE 9900177 W
  • DE 19802893 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802893A1] A vacuum interrupter chamber with a fixed- and an axially- movable contact-tip, and including a housing consisting of two cap-type metal parts, a ring-shaped insulator as well as a bellows, in which each contact-tip is associated with a current terminal, both cap-type metal parts are connected to the ring- shaped insulator and one cap-type metal part surrounds the fixed as well as the movable contact-tip. The current terminals of the two contact-tips (6,7) are designed as plates which form the floor region of one of the two cap-type metal parts. The bellows (5) forms the wall zone of that cap-type metal part which is associated with the movable contact (7). A tubular part (3) which is soldered at its end face to the plate- type current terminal (1) of the fixed contact-tip (6), and forms the wall-zone of the other cap-type metal part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 33/662 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66207 (2013.01); H01H 33/66238 (2013.01); H01H 2033/6613 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802893 A1 19990722; CN 1129159 C 20031126; CN 1288576 A 20010321; EP 1050058 A1 20001108; EP 1050058 B1 20011219; JP 2002502083 A 20020122; US 6417472 B1 20020709; WO 9938181 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100115

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100115

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090131

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900587 20020131

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI