Global Patent Index - EP 1050087 A1

EP 1050087 A1 2000-11-08 - CONNECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ACTUATING SLIDE

Title (en)

CONNECTOR ARRANGEMENT WITH AN ACTUATING SLIDE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER STECKER MIT EINEM BETÄTIGUNGSSCHIEBER

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE CONNECTEUR ET GLISSIERE D'ACTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1050087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900105 A

Priority

  • DE 19802554 A
  • IB 9900076 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802554A1] An electrical connector (1) has an actuating slide (2), for mating a second connector the actuating slide (2) having a locked entry position where the second connector can be inserted and a resilient arm (9) that is blocked by an edge of a guide slot (6) on one side from moving to a mated position and the resilient arm (9), is moved clear of the edge when the complementary, second connector (17) is inserted into the first connector (1), whereby through the subsequent actuation of the actuating slide (2) the two complementary connectors (1, 17) are joined together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62905 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938230A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802554 A1 19990805; AU 1779399 A 19990809; EP 1050087 A1 20001108; EP 1050087 B1 20020417; JP 2002502088 A 20020122; JP 4175600 B2 20081105; WO 9938230 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-09-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-12-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901287

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010402

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB